Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Beneficial Financi, Al I Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Zimmerman, Hallie N, against Ancheta, Dante F, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management386 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2010 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions48 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time48 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
March 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL |
|
March 04, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT | |
March 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
*ReOpened REOPEN/MISC/OTHER |
|
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL RE: VOID JUDGMENT |
|
February 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE OF ENTIRE ACTION NOT ENTERED - JUDGMENT ENTERED 2/15/11 |
|
February 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE AS TO DOES 1-10 O NLY |
|
February 15, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED Notes: DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DANTE F ANCHETA | |
February 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
*Request to Enter Default REQ TO ENTER DEFAULT Notes: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST DANTE F ANCHETA |
|
February 15, 2011 | Docket Event | WAIVER Notes: WAIVER OF ATTY'S FEES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.