Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fgh Farms, Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Cry, Debbie, Sprint, Sprint Nextel Corp, Oration, represented by Germaise, Susan L, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Maguire, Daniel presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management126 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2010 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time237 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
July 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
July 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion CONT BY COURT'S MTN |
|
July 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference NO APPEARANCES $200 SANCTIONS ORDERED CONTINUED TO/FOR: 10/06/11 1:30PM D10 FOR CMC Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
May 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Party Dismissed DISM PARTY Notes: SPRINT NEXTEL CORPORATION ONLY |
|
May 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
May 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
*Motion NO APPEARANCES MADE IN THIS MATTER COURT NOTES THERE IS A REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FOR THE DEFENDANTS SPRINT NEXTEL. MOTION TO STRIKE IS MOOT PER THE DISMISSAL OF REQUEST FOR SPRINT NEXTEL. DISMISSAL SHALL BE PROCESSED BY ROOM 103 Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
May 02, 2011 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: REQ FOR DISMISSAL OF SPRINT NEXTEL CORP ONLY | |
April 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference NO APPEARANCES CONT 07/14/11 1:30 CMC Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.