Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hunt & Henriques, against Biddle, Chester Orin, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management386 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2010 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions64 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time64 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Purge and Destroy FILE DEST - SCANNED Notes: FILE DESTROYED - SCANNED |
|
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE NOT ENTERED - JUDGMENT ALREADY ENTERED 2/24/2011 |
|
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED Notes: CHESTER ORIN BIDDLE | |
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: DECLARATION OF COUNSEL RE: INTEREST COSTS ATTORNEY FEES |
|
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Party Dismissed DISM PARTY Notes: AS TO DEFENDANTS: THE UNJUST ENRICHMENT CLAIM AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS |
|
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
*Request to Enter Default REQ TO ENTER DEFAULT Notes: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT |
|
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL |
|
January 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: CHESTER ORIN BIDDLE W/ SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE CC COVER SHEET, NTC OF CMC & ADR PKT ON 1/2/2011 |
|
December 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet COLL/$$ OWED/OPN BK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.