Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Us Bank National A, Ssociation N D, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Nelson, And Kennard, against Mohan, Shashi S, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management387 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2010 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time34 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Purge and Destroy FILE DEST - SCANNED Notes: FILE DESTROYED - SCANNED |
|
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: MATMOR FILE AWAY |
|
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: SHASHI S MOHAN W/SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CC COVERSHEET, NTC OF CMC, STIP TO CONTINUE CMC TO ATTEND ADR, ADR PKT, CMC POLICIES, ADR INFORMATION SHEET ON 1/16/11 |
|
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed LIMITED COLLECT COMP Notes: LIMITED COLLECTIONS CASE |
|
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |
|
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet COLL/$$ OWED/OPN BK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.