Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Us Bank National A, Ssociation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kennard, Robert Scott, against Steele, Charles C, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management387 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2010 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions86 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time86 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment - Partial WRIT PART SATISFIED Notes: WRIT FILED PARTIALLY SATISFIED IN THE SUM OF $16,471.90 |
|
February 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: MATMOR FILE AWAY |
|
February 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment ACK SATISFY JDGM Notes: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT |
|
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
September 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS Notes: $81.00 COSTS; $459.82 INTEREST; $792.18 CREDIT |
|
September 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: SANTA CLARA COUNTY $17,437.61 |
|
July 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: file away |
|
July 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT FILED* Notes: (writ of 4/22/11 to Yolo Sheriff) |
|
April 25, 2011 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT ISSUED $ Notes: ABSTRACT ISSUED | |
April 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: WRIT OF EXECUTION (Money Judgment) YOLO COUNTY SHERIF F $17,790.40 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.