Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Green Tree Servici, Ng, Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Schiff, Laurie, against Stevens, Michelle J, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 21, 2010 |
Category32: Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions2010 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time2010 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Purge and Destroy FILE DEST - SCANNED Notes: FILE DESTROYED - SCANNED |
|
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
CIVIL LAW AND MOTION MINUTE ORDER Motion to Dismiss MTN DISM LACK PROSEC SEE 6-22-16 M.O. SCANNED Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION OF ACTION (CCP 583.310 & CCP 538.410)-FILED | |
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLKS CERT OF MAIL |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC MTN DISM LACK PR Notes: COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION |
|
February 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
*Unlawful Detainer 60-Day Confidentiality Surpassed RESTORE CONF CASE Notes: RESTORE CONFIDENTIAL CASE |
|
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet UD - RESIDENTIAL |
|
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |
|
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
*Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed COMPL - UD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.