Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Campos, Elizabeth, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Fedex Corporation, Fedex Kinko'S Offi, Ce And Print Svcs, Inc, Khaldikar, Shailesh, Weber, John, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Kent O'Mara presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management167 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 22, 2008 |
Category15: Unlimited Other Employment |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time546 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
February 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
February 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
January 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONF ERENCE BY FAX |
|
January 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Continued by Party's Motion CONT BY PARTY'S MTN |
|
January 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: STIP AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CMC SENT TO REFEREE O'MARA , DEPT 10 |
|
October 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference ATTY A MCKENNA FOR PLTFF (CC) ATTY M SPRING FOR DEF (CC) CONTINUED TO/FOR: CMC 02/04/10 1:30PM D-10 NOTICED WAIVED Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
October 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Continued by Party's Motion CONT BY PARTY'S MTN |
|
September 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: REFEREE KENT O'MARA'S BOX |
|
September 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement CASE MGMT STATEMENT Notes: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT by Deft FedEx Office |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.