Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hsbc Bank Nevada N, Ational Asso Lvnv Fundin, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brachfeld, Law Group, P.C., against Brasher, April, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management189 days |
|
Filing DateMay 29, 2008 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time886 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF ENTIRE ACT ION |
|
November 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Change of Address NTC CHANGE/ADDRESS Notes: THE BRACHFELD LAW GROUP P.C., 880 APOLLO STREET, STE 155, ES SEGUNDO, CA, 90245 |
|
June 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
March 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Bankruptcy filed (Post-judgment) BANKRUPTCY Notes: NOTICE OF STAY |
|
December 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
November 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CONTINUANCE Notes: FROM 12/4/08 TO 6/11/09 1:30 D10 FOR JDGMT OR DISM |
|
November 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion CONT BY COURT'S MTN |
|
November 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement CASE MGMT STATEMENT Notes: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (filed by plaintiff) |
|
November 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: calendar file away |
|
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.