Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lvnv Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Su, Nancy Q, against Sanders, Floyd J, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management195 days |
|
Filing DateMay 23, 2008 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions102 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time187 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY UNSATSFD Notes: WRIT FILED WHOLLY UNSATISFIED SACRAMENTO |
|
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY UNSATSFD Notes: WRIT FILED WHOLLY UNSATISFIED SACRAMENTO COUNTY |
|
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY UNSATSFD Notes: WRIT FILED WHOLLY UNSATISFIED SACRAMENTO COUNTY |
|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY UNSATSFD Notes: WRIT FILED WHOLLY UNSATISFIED; LOS ANGELES COUNTY |
|
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: LOS ANGELES |
|
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS Notes: $0 CREDITS $502.34 INTEREST $5,466.92 PRINCIPAL REMAINING |
|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: $5,482.01 SACRAMENTO |
|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: SHRED |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS Notes: $50.09 INTEREST |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE* Notes: NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.