Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ramos Oil Co., Inc, ., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Montague, John D, against Basra, Jasbir Singh, Basra Trucking, In, C., in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management126 days |
|
Filing DateMay 29, 2008 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time154 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
November 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF ENTR DISM/POM |
|
October 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
October 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
September 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: COURT FILE ON MAIN SHELF CMS FILED 9/12/08 |
|
September 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CONTINUANCE Notes: FROM 10/2/08 TO 6/11/09 1:30 D10 PER JKO |
|
September 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion CONT BY COURT'S MTN |
|
September 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: susan berry |
|
September 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement CASE MGMT STATEMENT Notes: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (filed by plaintiff) |
|
July 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: BASRA TRUCKING, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP; JOHN EDWARDS, AGENT; WITH SUMMONS, COMPLAINT ETC ON 6/9/ 08 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.