Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Diemer, William, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kuppenbender, James C, against Pacific Retirement, Services, In C., University Retirem, Ent Communit Y At Davis, represented by Napoli, James A, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Kent O'Mara presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management126 days |
|
Filing DateMay 22, 2008 |
Category06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial453 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions210 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Dismissal DISM OF X-COMPL Notes: DISMISSAL OF CROSS-COMPLAINT OF UNIVERSITY RETIREMENT COMMUNITY AT DAVIS INC, ET AL |
|
January 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
August 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Jury JURY TRIAL Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
|
August 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference TRIAL READINESS CONF Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
|
August 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Settlement Conference SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD W/O COURTROOM CLERK PLAINTIFF M P DIEMER PRESENT PLAINTIFF JAMES NAPOLI, CHRISTOPHER NOT NOTED ON MINUTE ORDER BUT STICKY NOTE STATES SETTLED; STIPULATION TO BE IN CLOSED ENVELOPE Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
August 07, 2009 | Docket Event | STIPULATION* Notes: FOR SETTLEMENT CONFIDENTIAL STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT REACHED AT MSC ON 8/7/09 PLACED IN CONFIDENTIAL ENVELOPE | |
August 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: SUSAN BERRY |
|
August 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement SETTLMNT CONF STMT Notes: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY WILLIAM DIEMER |
|
August 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: J K O'MARA FOR 8/7/09 MSC |
|
July 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Settlement Conference
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.