Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ayala, Ramon, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Shea, Mark D, against Singh, Naranjan, Kaur, Baljjinder, represented by Johnston, G. Michael, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with White, Kathleen presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management125 days |
|
Filing DateMay 23, 2008 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto |
Time To Trial333 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time326 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Jury JURY TRIAL Judge: White, Kathleen M |
|
April 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
April 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL W/ PREJ |
|
April 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference TRIAL READINESS CONF Judge: White, Kathleen M |
|
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event | COPIES OF DOCUMENTS Notes: MAILED IN SASE ALONG W/ A LETTER INFORMING THEM THAT THEIR CMC WILL BE HEARD IN DEPT.10(GAVE ADDRESS) AND NOT 16, AS IT STATES ON THEIR CMC | |
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement CASE MGMT STATEMENT Notes: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY DEFTS BALJINDER KAUR/ NARAJAN S |
|
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Continuance of Hearing or Case Mgmt Conference CNT CMC NTC SETTLED Notes: CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT NTC OF SETTLEMENT FILED |
|
February 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement SETTLMNT CONF STMT Notes: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
February 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Settlement Conference SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HEARD W/O COURTROOM CLERK ATTY MARK SHEA PRESENT W/PLAINTIFF ATTY MICHAEL MCKONE PRESENT W/DEFENDANT THE CASE, INCLUDING ALL CROSS ACTIONS, IS SETTLED. THE TRIAL DATE AND THE TRIAL READINESS DATES ARE ORDERED VACATED Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
January 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement SETTLMNT CONF STMT Notes: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY DEFTS BALJINDER KAUR; NARAJAN SINGH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.