Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Launitz, Andrew, Launitz, Irene, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Giguiere, Michele Louise, against Curtis, Geoffrey A, Curtis, Rebecca E, Nootenboom, Mark, Pilsner, Penny Lee, represented by Chandler, James P, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Reed, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeReed, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 24, 2007 |
Category32: Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time43 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment ACK SATISFY JDGM Notes: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT |
|
June 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Unlawful Detainer 60-Day Confidentiality Surpassed RESTORE CONF CASE Notes: RESTORE CONFIDENTIAL CASE |
|
June 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY SATISFD Notes: WRIT WHOLLY SATISFIED as to possession only |
|
June 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: file away |
|
June 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: YOLO COUNTY AS TO POSSESSION ONLY - ISSUED PER GAIL REYNOLDS |
|
June 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL PLTFF A. LAUNITZ PRESENT W ATTY GIGUIERE DEF PILSNER AND NOOTENBOOM PRESENT W ATTY CHOUNDHERY Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
June 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWAY |
|
June 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney SUBST OF ATTORNEY Notes: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY JAMES P. CHANDLER IN PLACE OF IN PRO PER FOR MARK NOOTENBOOM |
|
June 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney SUBST OF ATTORNEY |
|
June 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney SUBST OF ATTORNEY Notes: UBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY JAMES P. CHANDLER IN PLACE OF IN PRO PER FOR PENNEY LEE PILSNER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.