Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Harmon, Ann Brown, Lehman, Ben J, filed a(n) 42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case against Loman, Kathleen, Loman, Patrick, represented by Borges, Guy D, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Gaard, Janet presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management125 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2007 |
Category42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time883 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
July 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL W/ PREJ |
|
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion CONT BY COURT'S MTN Notes: TO 10-22-2009 D-10 AT 1:30PM FOR ENTRY OF DISMISSAL |
|
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference PLAINTIFF NOT PRESENT DEFENDANTS ATTN: HENRY WILLIAMS PRES BY COURT CALL DISMISSAL TO ENTER CONT TO 10-22-09 DEPT 10 AT 1:30PM CLERK TO SEND NOTICE Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL Notes: NTC OF CONT CMC FOR ENTRY OF DISMISSAL TO 10-22-09 IN DEPT 10 AT 1:30PM |
|
June 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement CASE MGMT STATEMENT Notes: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANTS KATHLEEN LOMAN AND PATRICK LOMAN |
|
June 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: ADR CLERK, RM 103 |
|
June 11, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION GRANTED* Notes: MOTION GRANTED | |
June 11, 2009 | Docket Event | TENTATIVE RULING PST Notes: TENTATIVE RULING POSTED | |
June 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Motion NO APPEARANCES TENTATIVE RULING ADOPTED MOTION GRANTED Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.