Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kumar, Sashi, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Swanson, Palmer J, against Bandhu, Jasodha Jasram, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2007 |
Category32: Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time36 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Unlawful Detainer 60-Day Confidentiality Surpassed RESTORE CONF CASE Notes: RESTORE CONFIDENTIAL CASE |
|
March 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL REFEREE REED CLERKS NAVARRETTE/WILSON PLAINTIFF APPEARING W/ATTY SWANSON DEFENDANT NOT APPEARING WITNESS SWORN Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
March 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
At-Issue Memorandum AT ISSUE MEMO - UD |
|
March 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited ANSWER Notes: BY DEFT JASODHA JASRAM BANDHU |
|
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of UD Action NTC UD ACTION Notes: 04-24-07 |
|
February 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed COMPL - UD |
|
February 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet UD - RESIDENTIAL |
|
February 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |
|
February 20, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE* Notes: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE CV05-1331 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.