Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lhr Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Booska, Steven A., against Fitzgerald, Larry L, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management209 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2007 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions167 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time175 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case ORDER OF EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR LARRY L. FITZGERALD NO APPEARANCES DROPPED FROM CALENDAR Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Application for Order for Judgment Debtor Exam APP/ORD DEBTOR EXAM Notes: FOR DEBTOR LARRY L. FITZGERALD |
|
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY UNSATSFD Notes: WRIT FILED WHOLLY UNSATISIFIED |
|
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: MATMOR |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: NAPA CO. - $8080.37 |
|
November 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Change of Address NTC CHANGE/ADDRESS |
|
November 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: DECLARATION OF STEVEN A BOOSKA RE: POST JUDGMENT ACCRUED INTEREST |
|
November 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS |
|
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: COUNTY OF YOLO MONEY JUDGMENT IN AMOUNT OF $6082.52 |
|
September 21, 2007 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT ISSUED $ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.