Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Palisades Acquisit, Ion Xvi, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Wolpoff & Abramson, Llp, against Halsell, Gwendolyn D, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management185 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2007 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions234 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time242 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
August 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Change of Address NTC CHANGE FIRM NAME Notes: WOLPOFF & ABRAMSON, LLP, ATTY FPLTFF; CHANGED TO MANN BRACKEN, LLC. |
|
August 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Request to Enter Default REQ TO ENTER DEFAULT Notes: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST GWENDOLYN D. HALSELL |
|
August 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: RE COMPUTATION OF INTEREST |
|
August 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: OF COMPLIANCE WITH CCP SECTION 1033B2 |
|
August 11, 2008 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED | |
August 11, 2008 | Docket Event | FILED* Notes: EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT | |
June 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
June 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CONTINUANCE Notes: CONT'D FROM 6 23 08 TO 1 22 09 PER JKO |
|
June 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion CONT BY COURT'S MTN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.