Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Seville Davis, Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Link, Gary L, against Asbery, Pat, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2006 |
Category32: Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time48 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: UD FILE AWAY BIN |
|
November 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL PLTF PRES W/BY ATTY HOGAN DEFS N/P COU PROCEEDS BY OFFER OF PROOF JANNA CANNON S&T DEF VACATED PREMISES 10-31-06 COURT ORDERS: PRINCIPAL: $3050,00 COSTS: $320.00 JUDGEMENT FOR PLTF RENTAL CONTRACT CANCELED ORDER SIGNED IN OPEN COURT Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
October 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
At-Issue Memorandum AT ISSUE MEMO - UD |
|
October 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited ANSWER Notes: patricia asberry |
|
October 06, 2006 | Docket Event | APPLICATION* Notes: APPLICATION AND DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR AN ORDER TO HAVE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT POSTED AND MAIL ED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO THE DEFT(S) (CCP SECTION 415. 45) | |
October 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order for Publication ORD FOR POSTING |
|
September 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of UD Action NTC UD ACTION Notes: 11-28-06 |
|
September 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |
|
September 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet UD - RESIDENTIAL |
|
September 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed COMPL - UD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.