Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
International Cred, It Recovery, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lusk, Keith W, against Gobel, Rick, O.G. Farms, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management133 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2006 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions130 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time130 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment ACK SATISFY JDGM Notes: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT IN FULL |
|
March 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: GAIL/FILE AWAY |
|
March 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS Notes: $116.00 COSTS; $285.48 INTEREST |
|
February 15, 2007 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT ISSUED $ | |
February 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
February 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
February 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: RICK GOBAL AKA FREDERICK L GOBAL AKA FREDERIC K GOBAL; INC. & GUARANTOR FOR O G FARMS INC.AKA O G F ARMS WITH SUMMONS, COMPLAINT NTC OF CMC, ADR ON 11/25 /2006 |
|
February 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: O G FARMS INC., AKA O G FARMS INC. WITH SUMMO NS, COMPLT, ADR AND CMC PKG ON 11/25/06 |
|
February 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Request to Enter Default REQ TO ENTER DEFAULT Notes: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAIST DEFT O.G. FARMS INC. AKA OG FARMS INC., RICK GOBEL AKA FREDERICK L. GOBEL AKA FREDERICK GOBEL; IND. & GUARANTOR FOR O.G. FARMS, INC. AKA OG FARMS INC. |
|
February 02, 2007 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.