Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Resurgence Financi, Al, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Patenaude & Felix, Apc, against Yarbrough, Joanne, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management129 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2006 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time201 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Bankruptcy filed (Post-judgment) BANKRUPTCY NTC REC'D Notes: BANKRUPTCY NOTICE REC'D W/DIST/ NO DISTRIBUTION |
|
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: MCCELLAN FILE AWAY |
|
May 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause
Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
May 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
April 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
March 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
March 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
March 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
March 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Continuance of Hearing or Case Mgmt Conference CNT CMC N/APPEARANCE Notes: CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT WITHOUT APPEARANCE |
|
March 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion CONT BY COURT'S MTN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.