Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Berny, Carol, Berny, Khalid, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Beyer, Pongratz & Rosen, against Boyko, Vladimir, Valley Farms Trans, Portation, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management291 days |
|
Filing DateJune 23, 2005 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time197 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Bail Reversal BAIL REVSL -GENERAL Notes: BAIL REVERSAL applied to filing fee |
|
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE @ SHELF |
|
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF ENTR DISM/POM Notes: NTC OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE |
|
May 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
April 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference MATTER IS SET FOR FURTHER CMC Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
November 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Motion MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE NO APPEARANCE, TENTATIVE RULING ADOPTED VALLEY FARMS TRNASPORTATION AND VLADMIR BOYKO'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASE NOS.PM 05-607 AND PM 05-997 IS GRANTED. VALLEY FARMS TRANSPORTATION AND VLADMIR BOYKO FILED THEIR MOTIONTO CONOSLIDATE IN CASE NO.PM 05-997 ONLY. VALLEY FARMS TRANSPORTATION AND VLADMIR BOYKO ARE DIRECTED TO FILE A COPY OF THE MOTION PAPERS IN CASE NO.05-607, IN ACCORDANCE WITH CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 367,SUBDIVISION(A), WITHIN FIVE(5) DAYS OF THIS ORDER. VALLEY FARMS TRANSPORTATION AND VLADMIR BOYKO ARE FURTHER DIRECTED TO PROVIDE TWO COPIES OF THE ORDER ON THIS MOTION FOR THE COURT'S SIGNITURESO THAT A COPY OF THE ORDER MAY BE FILED IN EACH OF THE CASES SOUGHT TO BE CONSOLIDATED AS REQUIRED BY SUBDIVISION(C) OF RULE 367. Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
October 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: DOLLYS CALENDAR FILE AWAY |
|
October 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: VLADIMIR BOYKO 6/30/05 WITH SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CAUSE OF ACTION; ADR PACKET; STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE ADR; NOTICE OF INCLUSION IN TRIAL COURT DELAY REDUCTION ACT CASE MG; STATEMENT OF DAMAGES. |
|
October 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS - SUBSERVICE* Notes: PARTY SERVED VALLEY FARMS TRANSPORTATION BY SERVING JOE MATLEN-CONTROLLER AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE 7605 WITH SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CAUSE OF ACTION; ADR PACKET; STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE ADR; NOTICE OF INCLUSION IN TRIAL COURT DELAY REDUCTION ACT CASE MG; STATEMENT OF DAMAGES. |
|
October 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: ACCORDIAN CALENDAR FILE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.