Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cavalry Portofolio, Services Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Winn, Brian N, against Neal, Denise, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management291 days |
|
Filing DateJune 23, 2005 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions96 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time103 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS Notes: PRINCIPAL $15,052.22 $6,785.46 INTEREST |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: MONEY JUDGMENT - YOLO $21,877.68 |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents RETURNED DOCUMENTS Notes: RETURNED DOCUMENTS: WRIT; #14 ON WRIT DOES NOT MATCH MEMO OF COSTS |
|
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: SONOMA; $20.914.13 |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS Notes: $5,136.91 INTEREST |
|
July 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: COUNTY OF MARIN $17081.86 |
|
July 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS Notes: $1304.64 INTEREST |
|
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: SHRED |
|
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Application for & Renewal of Judgment (EJ-190) RENEWAL OF JDGM* Notes: SERVED: DENISE NEAL WITH NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT & APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT BY MAIL ON 10-21-15 |
|
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: SHRED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.