Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Simpson, Mark Stevan, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jacobs, Jon P, against Ford Motor Company, Woodland Motors Co, Rporation, represented by Guichard, Matthew P, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management291 days |
|
Filing DateJune 23, 2005 |
Category06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: SHELF |
|
April 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC UNAVAIL COUNSEL Notes: UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL FOR PLTF MARK STEVAN SIMPSON FROM 6/16/06 THROUGH 6/28/06 |
|
April 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: SHELF |
|
April 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
April 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF ENTR DISM/POM |
|
March 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
March 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Party Dismissed DISM PARTY Notes: AS TO PLTF AND DEFT/X-COMPLAINANT WOODLAND MOTORS CORP. WAIVE ATTY FEES AND COSTS AS AGAINST EACH OTHER. |
|
February 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement NTC OF SETTLEMENT Notes: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 877.6(A)(2) / CONDITIONAL FILED BY JON P. JACOBS/ATTY FOR PLTFF |
|
February 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE |
|
August 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited ANSWER CIVIL/PROBATE Notes: DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.