Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Beneficial Califor, Nia, Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Eskanos & Adler, against Casado, Alex R, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management340 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2005 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions155 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time155 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment ACK SATISFY JDGM Notes: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT |
|
March 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY UNSATSFD Notes: WRIT FILED WHOLLY UNSATISIFIED SACRAMENTO COUNTY |
|
March 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: GAIL/FILE AWAY |
|
November 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
October 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: SACRAMENTO CO FOR $ 5,450.54 |
|
October 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS Notes: $600.00 CREDIT, $30.74 INTEREST |
|
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion Notes ADD FIXED CASE Notes: ADD FIXED CASE - BEGIN JBSIS STATS |
|
May 26, 2006 | Docket Event | WAIVER Notes: WAIVER OF EXCESS ATTYS FEES | |
May 26, 2006 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED | |
May 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Dismissal of Does DISM OF "DOES" Notes: AS TO DOES 1-10 ONLY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.