Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lavinsky, Ivan S, against Wenk, Stefan, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Assigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management293 days |
Filing DateJuly 26, 2005 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time335 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause
Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
July 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference AS PER CMC ORDER W/O APPEARANCE BY D. BLICKER (AMENDED) Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
July 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause Post-Disposition
Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
June 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
May 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause OSC* Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
|
May 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Continuance of Hearing or Case Mgmt Conference CNT CMC N/APPEARANCE Notes: CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT WITHOUT APPEARANCE (AMENDED) |
|
May 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
May 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
May 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
Continuance of Hearing or Case Mgmt Conference CNT CMC N/APPEARANCE Notes: CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT WITHOUT APPEARANCE |
|
May 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.