Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Barrett Business S, Ervices, Inc ., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Kim, Jason, against Dhesi, Mohinder, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFall, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management292 days |
Filing DateJuly 20, 2005 |
Category35: Unlimited Other Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort |
Time To Trial839 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time799 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Jury JURY TRIAL Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference TRIAL READINESS CONF Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
October 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Settlement Conference
Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
October 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Settlement Conference
Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
September 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
August 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion CONT BY COURT'S MTN |
|
August 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CONTINUANCE Notes: ON COURT'S MOTION, SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SET FOR 10/1/07 IS VACATED AND RESET TO 10/3/07 AT 1:30 P.M. |
|
August 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference BOTH COUNSEL APPEAR VIA COURT CALL. MATTER SET FOR 4 DAY JURY TRIAL. Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
August 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: D BLICKER AUG BOX |
|
August 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement CASE MGMT STATEMENT Notes: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLTFF MOHINDER DHESI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.