Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Martinez, Joe, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gardner, Janes, Nakken, Etc, against Hawatky, Mohamed, Hawatky, Sue M., represented by Ford, Harold L, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management265 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2005 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
Time To Trial742 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time721 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court COURT TRIAL Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWAY |
|
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF ENTR DISM/POM |
|
January 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
November 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF ENTR DISM/POM |
|
November 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Dismissal DISM OF X-COMPL Notes: DISMISSAL OF CROSS-COMPLAINTS FILED BY SUE M. HAWATKY ON 5/31/05 AND MOHAMMED HAWATKY ON 5/31/05 |
|
November 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF THE CROSS-COM PLAINT FILED BY SUE M. HAWATKY ON 5/31/05 AND THE CRO SS-COMPLAINT FILED BY MOHAMMED HAWATKY ON 5/31/05 |
|
October 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: CASE SENT TO: SHELF |
|
October 19, 2006 | Docket Event | CLAIM FORM TO FISCAL Notes: CLAIM TO FISCAL FOR PAYMENT OF ARBITRATOR DAVID CALFE E | |
October 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Settlement Conference DROPPED FROM CALENDAR; CASE SETTLED. Judge: Petre, Donna M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.