Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
U.S. Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kennard, Robert Scott, against Nichols, Barbara J, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFall, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management271 days |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2004 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions268 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time268 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
December 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
*ReOpened REOPEN NO FEE PAID Notes: (reopen to dismiss case after judgment entered and then set aside per order of 11/18/05) |
|
November 18, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF | |
November 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application EX PARTE* Notes: APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT AND DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY ROBERT S. KENNARD IN SUPPORT THEREOF |
|
September 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE |
|
September 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: BARBARA J NICHOLS ON 6/29/05 SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT |
|
September 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
September 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Request to Enter Default REQ TO ENTER DEFAULT Notes: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST BARBARA J NICHOLS |
|
September 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Dismissal of Does DISM OF "DOES" Notes: AS TO DOES 1-10 ONLY |
|
September 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: BARBARA J. NICHOLS ON 6/29/05 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.