Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Godinez, Gonzalo, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Wilkinson, Susan L, against Esparza, Rodolfo, Randolph, Nancy L, Rudy'S Stocking An, D Hauling Co Mpany, Zapata, Jose, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management241 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 27, 2004 |
Category35: Unlimited Other Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time461 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF ENTR DISM/POM |
|
December 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: MAIN SHELF |
|
December 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
July 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF ENTR DISM/POM |
|
July 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: WITH PREJUDICE |
|
July 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Dismissal DISM OF X-COMPL Notes: DISMISSAL OF CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY RUDY'S STOCKING AND HAULING COMPANY ON 11/22/04 |
|
July 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF ENTR DISM/POM |
|
July 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
July 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Party Dismissed DISM PARTY Notes: AS TO RUDY'S STOCKING AND HAULING COMPANY |
|
June 30, 2005 | Docket Event | AMENDED* Notes: AMENDED NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT - FILED BY PLTFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.