Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Great Seneca Finan, Cial Corp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Guffey, William O, against Beatty, Sheila, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management238 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 23, 2004 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions289 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time294 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: MATMOR FILE AWAY |
|
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY UNSATSFD Notes: WRIT FILED WHOLLY UNSATISIFIED |
|
July 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Abstract Issued ABST/WRIT ISSUED* Notes: WRIT OF EXECUTION (Money Judgment) SACRAMENTO COUNTY SHERIFF $5,407.21 |
|
July 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS Notes: ACCRUED INTERST $1,564.60 |
|
August 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause
Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
July 15, 2005 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT ISSUED $ Notes: ABSTRACT ISSUED $3,827.61 | |
June 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order Granted ORD GRANTING* Notes: USE OF COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS |
|
June 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |
|
June 08, 2005 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED Notes: ENTERED AS REQUESTED | |
June 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Request to Enter Default REQ TO ENTER DEFAULT Notes: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT as to SHEILA BEATTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.