Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sherman Acquisitio, N Ii L P, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Eskanos & Adler, against Loera, Thomas C Jr, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management242 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 19, 2004 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions412 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time426 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2005 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT ISSUED $ | |
December 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
Assignment of Judgment ASSIGN JUDGMENT Notes: SHERMAN ACQUISITION II, L.P. ASSIGNED TO LVNV FUNDING LLC |
|
October 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
October 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
Dismissal of Does DISM OF "DOES" Notes: AS TO DOES 1 TO 10 ONLY |
|
October 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: OF COMPLIANCE WITH CCP SECTION 1033 (B) (2) |
|
October 05, 2005 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED | |
October 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Request to Enter Default REQ TO ENTER DEFAULT Notes: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST THOMAS C LOERA JR |
|
August 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Trial Setting Conference TRIAL SETTING CONF MATTER HEARD WITH/BY ATTORNEY: CRAIG ELKIN FOR PLTF TSC VACATED COURT STRIKES DEFENDANTS ANSWER FILED ON 9-9-04 PLAINTIFF MAY SUBMIT REQUEST FOR DEFAULT Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
July 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
|
July 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IN RESPONSE TO STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.