Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Account Control Te, Chnology, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kaplan, Gary L, against Boatright, Carl T, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management235 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 19, 2004 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions88 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time89 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: file away |
|
July 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY UNSATSFD Notes: WRIT FILED WHOLLY UNSATISIFIED |
|
May 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS Notes: $26.00 COSTS; $360.00 CREDIT; $3,961.94 INTEREST |
|
May 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: ORANGE COUNTY FOR $18,479.98 |
|
September 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney SUBST OF ATTORNEY Notes: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY frank g. blundo for account control technology in place of gary l. kaplan |
|
April 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
December 03, 2004 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT ISSUED $ Notes: $14,837.04 | |
November 15, 2004 | Docket Event |
*Request to Enter Default REQ TO ENTER DEFAULT Notes: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT |
|
November 15, 2004 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: DECLARATION OF GARY L. KAPLAN |
|
November 15, 2004 | Docket Event |
Dismissal of Does DISM OF "DOES" Notes: DOES 1-10 INCLUSIVE ONLY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.