Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
River Garden Farms, Co, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Spahr, Peter, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management238 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 16, 2004 |
Category23: Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time437 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF ENTR DISM/POM |
|
November 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: SHELF |
|
October 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
October 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference CASE MGMT CONF RE: STATUS OF DISC AND MEDIATION NO APPEARANCE CASE SETTLED. DISMISSAL ON FILE. DROPPED FROM CALENDAR. Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
July 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference CASE MGMT CONF RE: STATUS OF DISC. AND MEDIATION VACATED AND RESET TO 10-3-05 Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
April 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
April 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference CASE MGMT CONF N DESAI FOR PLTF BY C.C. V BAKER FOR DEF CONTINUED TO/FOR: CMC RE: STATUS OF MEDIATION 7-25-05 9:00 DEPT. 2 COU TO SUBMIT A LETTER RE: MEDIATORS NAME AND DATE FOR MEDIATION. NO APPEARANCE REQUIRED IF CASE SETTLED. IF STILL IN MEDIATION-COU CAN SUBMIT A JOINT REQUEST TO CONTINUE. Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
April 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement CASE MGMT STATEMENT Notes: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by deft PETER SPAHR (filed by fax seq #931003379) |
|
March 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement CASE MGMT STATEMENT Notes: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (filed by plaintiff) |
|
March 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: calendar basket |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.