Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ayala, Carlos, Martinello, Ondria, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lowe, Nicholas K., against Ali, Mohammed, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFall, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management272 days |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2003 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time381 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference CASE MGMT CONF RE: STATUS OF MEDIATION Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
January 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
January 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL |
|
January 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement NTC OF SETTLEMENT Notes: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 877.6(A)(2) |
|
January 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement CASE MGMT STATEMENT Notes: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT - PLAINTIFFS |
|
December 22, 2004 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CONTINUANCE |
|
December 22, 2004 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
September 27, 2004 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference CASE MGMT CONF K PRESTON FOR PLTF BY C.C. D FANARA FOR DEF BY C.C. COU AGREE TO MEDIATE THE CASE. PLTF DEPO IS SET FOR 9-28-04. PARTIES CAN MEDIATE THIS CASE W/IN 45 DAYS. CONTINUED TO/FOR: CMC RE: STATUS OF MEDIATION 1-24-05 1:30 DEPT. 2 NO APPEARANCE REQUIRED IF CASE IS SETTLED AND DISM ON FILE. ATTY PRESTON TO SEND NOTICE OF MEDIATORS NAME AND DATE FOR MEDIATION BY END OF 10/04. Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
September 08, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement CASE MGMT STATEMENT Notes: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT - PLAINTIFFS |
|
August 10, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE* Notes: of Firm Name Change for Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.