Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cavalry Portfolio, Services, Ll C, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Winn, Brian N, against Mcclure, Christoph Sr., in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Assigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management269 days |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2003 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions69 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time69 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY UNSATSFD Notes: WRIT FILED WHOLLY UNSATISFIED WOODLAND ,CA |
|
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLKS CERT OF MAIL |
|
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
CIVIL LAW AND MOTION MINUTE ORDER *Opposition to Claim of Exemption OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION DEF MCLURE PRES CLAIM OF EXEMPTION-GRANTED OAH SIGNED BY COURT ORDER FAXED TO YCSO Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Claim of Exemption CLM EXMP GRANTED Notes: FUNDS ORDERED RETURNED TO DEBTOR |
|
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order ORD DETERM CLM EXMPT Notes: ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION-FILED |
|
August 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING - (CIVIL) *Other Hearing Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Claim of Exemption NTC OPPOSE CLM EXEMP Notes: NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC HRG CLM OF EXMPT Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION |
|
August 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Claim of Exemption CLM OF EXEMPTION Notes: FILED BY DEFT CHRISTOPH MCCLURE, SR. |
|
August 03, 2015 | Docket Event | LODGING OF DOCUMENTS Notes: ORD DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.