Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Frank R. Skover &, Associates, Skover, Frank R., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hoffman, Howard M, against Gill, Sarjit K., Gill, Tejinder S., in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Assigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management347 days |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2003 |
Category06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time410 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
April 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference CASE MGMT CONF RE: STATUS OF SETTLEMENT Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
February 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF ENTR DISM/POM |
|
January 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL |
|
January 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CONTINUANCE |
|
January 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
November 29, 2004 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference CASE MGMT CONF RE: STATUS OF MEDIATION-VACATED AND RESET TO 4-25-05 AT REQUEST OF PLTFS COU Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
November 10, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement CASE MGMT STATEMENT Notes: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT PLAINTIFFS |
|
August 23, 2004 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference CASE MGMT CONF M STEUER FOR PLTF D CALFEE FOR DEF MARK EATON IS MEDIATOR AND MEDIATION IS SCHEDULED FOR 11-1-04. CONTINUED TO/FOR: CMC RE: STATUS OF MEDIATION 11-29-04 1:30 DEPT. 2 IF CASE IS SETTLED AND DISMISSAL ON FILE-NO APPEARANCE REQUIRED. Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
August 06, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement CASE MGMT STATEMENT Notes: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Filed by Pltff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.