Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Onebeacon America, Insurance Co Mpany A Mass, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Harrington, Michael John, against Brunswick Corporat, Ion A Delawa Re Corporati, Mercury Marine A D, Ivision Of B Runswick Cor, Southwest Boats, I, Nc,An Arizon Corporation, Tripp, Keith L, represented by Lombardi, Loper & Conant, Llp, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFall, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management251 days |
Filing DateDecember 09, 2003 |
Category23: Limited Other Pi/Pd/Wd - 10,000 - 25,000 |
Time To Trial1148 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1142 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: SHELF |
|
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF ENTR DISM/POM |
|
January 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Jury JURY TRIAL Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
January 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE BY FAX |
|
January 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference TRIAL READINESS CONF Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
January 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
January 09, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: TO VACATE HEARINGS SIGNED BY DMB AS PER FILING OF NTC OF SETLMT | |
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Settlement Conference
Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
January 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement NTC OF SETTLEMENT Notes: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 877.6(A)(2) |
|
January 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: DEPT 4 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.