Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Woodmark Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Link, Gary L, against Brenes, Rose, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2001 |
Category32: Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions2223 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time2223 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Minute Comment ORD OSC-DISM FST TRK Notes: FILED |
|
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss MTN DISM LACK PROSEC NO APPEARANCE MOTION GRANTED Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
January 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Motion MTN DISM-LACK PROSEC |
|
January 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
January 31, 2001 | Docket Event |
Order for Publication ORD FOR POSTING |
|
January 29, 2001 | Docket Event | APPLICATION* Notes: AND DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR AN ORDER TO HAVE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT POSTED AND MAILED. | |
January 12, 2001 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS ISSUED |
|
January 12, 2001 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet UD - RESIDENTIAL |
|
January 12, 2001 | Docket Event |
*Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed COMPL - UD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.