Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Oakley, Roger G, filed a(n) 42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case against Marambio, Erika, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWarriner, Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2000 |
Category42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss
Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
April 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
Letter LTR RETURNED Notes: LETTER RETURNED TO COURT UNDELIVERED - ROGER G. OAKLEY - NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED; UNABLE TO FORWARD |
|
April 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Motion MTN DISM-LACK PROSEC |
|
April 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
August 31, 2000 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause OSC* Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER F0R HARASSMENT/DENIED PENDING HEARING |
|
August 31, 2000 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause
Judge: Johnson, W Arvid |
|
August 30, 2000 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet OTHER PETITION |
|
August 30, 2000 | Docket Event |
Petition PETN* Notes: FOR HARASSMENT |
|
August 30, 2000 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: RE HARASSMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.