Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Dignes, Larry B, Kirchert, Lori M, Larry B Dignes, Lori M Kirchert, Lowe, Sheila M, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Elder Abuse - Torts case represented by York, Wendy C, Esq., against Covenant Care California Llc, Covenant Care Llc, represented by Deering, Robert R, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Sandhu, Sonny S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandhu, Sonny S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management123 days |
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2020 |
CategoryElder Abuse Or Dependent Adult Abuse: Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeElder Abuse |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint alleges multiple causes of action against the defendants, Covenant Care California, LLC, Covenant Care, LLC, and Does 1 through 50. The plaintiffs, Sheila M. Lowe and Lori M. Kirchert, are the successors-in-interest to Larry B. Dignes,...
Declaration
Date: October 20, 2022Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: October 20, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 20, 2022Proof of Service
Date: November 03, 2022Declaration
Date: November 03, 2022Pleading Document
Date: September 01, 2023Ruling
Date: December 12, 2022Objection
Date: May 10, 2023Declaration
Date: September 01, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: May 19, 2023Proof of Service
Date: May 10, 2023Pleading Document
Date: September 06, 2023Supplemental Declaration
Date: May 16, 2023Supplemental Declaration
Date: September 01, 2023Party Appeared by Audio/Video
Date: June 07, 2023Pleading Document
Date: September 01, 2023Proof of Service
Date: September 01, 2023Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 01, 2023Case Management Conference Statement
Date: October 12, 2023Pleading Document
Date: September 01, 2023Declaration
Date: September 01, 2023Pleading Document
Date: September 06, 2023Party Appeared by Audio/Video
Date: October 30, 2023Case Management Conference Statement
Date: October 12, 2023Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 18, 2020Declaration
Date: September 18, 2020Complaint - Wrongful Death
Date: September 18, 2020Case Management Conference Statement
Date: December 22, 2020Summons Issued / Filed
Date: September 21, 2020Proof of Service of Summons - Substituted Service
Date: January 25, 2021Proposed Order
Date: March 12, 2021Proof of Service of Summons - Posting/Mailing
Date: January 25, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet - Plaintiff(s)
Date: September 18, 2020Proof of Service
Date: March 12, 2021Answer/General Denial
Date: January 20, 2021Stipulation and Order
Date: April 07, 2021Advance Jury Fee (Non-Refundable)
Date: January 13, 2021Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: March 12, 2021Declaration
Date: March 12, 2021Declaration
Date: June 24, 2021Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: April 26, 2023Opposition to Motion
Date: November 03, 2022Case Management Conference Statement
Date: April 29, 2021Opposition to Motion
Date: June 24, 2021Case Management Conference Statement
Date: April 28, 2021Declaration
Date: April 26, 2023Supplemental Declaration
Date: September 28, 2021Declaration
Date: September 28, 2021Notice
Date: January 25, 2021Stipulation & Order to Continue a Hearing
Date: June 11, 2021Under Submission
Date: December 10, 2021Under Submission
Date: July 08, 2021Declaration
Date: October 15, 2021Ruling
Date: January 03, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 12, 2021Opposition
Date: October 21, 2021Opposition
Date: November 12, 2021Case Management Conference Statement
Date: November 04, 2021Proof of Service
Date: September 28, 2021Party Appeared by Audio/Video
Date: June 06, 2022Proof of Service
Date: November 09, 2022Proof of Service
Date: June 30, 2021Objection
Date: November 03, 2022Notice
Date: January 20, 2022Supplemental Declaration
Date: November 12, 2021Reply to Opposition
Date: June 30, 2021Declaration
Date: June 30, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: April 26, 2023Objection
Date: June 30, 2021Case Management Conference Statement
Date: January 14, 2022Case Management Conference Statement
Date: April 21, 2023Reply to Opposition
Date: November 09, 2022Party Appeared by Audio/Video
Date: May 08, 2023Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 26, 2023Declaration
Date: May 10, 2023Case Management Conference Statement
Date: April 19, 2023Notice
Date: January 31, 2022Case Management Conference Statement
Date: May 20, 2022Case Management Conference Statement
Date: November 05, 2021Declaration
Date: April 26, 2023Case Management Conference Statement
Date: May 11, 2022Declaration
Date: April 26, 2023Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: October 20, 2022Supplemental Declaration
Date: May 16, 2023Reply to Opposition
Date: May 16, 2023Under Submission
Date: November 17, 2022Opposition to Motion
Date: May 10, 2023Proof of Service of Summons - Posting/Mailing
Date: January 25, 2021Declaration
Date: October 20, 2022Declaration
Date: September 18, 2020Proof of Service
Date: March 12, 2021Declaration
Date: October 20, 2022Declaration
Date: March 12, 2021Proof of Service
Date: September 28, 2021Objection
Date: November 03, 2022Declaration
Date: March 12, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 20, 2022Declaration
Date: September 28, 2021Proof of Service of Summons - Substituted Service
Date: January 25, 2021Case Management Conference Statement
Date: January 14, 2022Summons Issued / Filed
Date: September 21, 2020Declaration
Date: November 03, 2022Complaint - Wrongful Death
Date: September 18, 2020Case Management Conference Statement
Date: April 29, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 12, 2021Declaration
Date: September 28, 2021Declaration
Date: October 15, 2021Opposition to Motion
Date: November 03, 2022Proof of Service of Summons - Posting/Mailing
Date: January 25, 2021Case Management Conference Statement
Date: November 05, 2021Stipulation and Order
Date: April 07, 2021Supplemental Declaration
Date: September 28, 2021Case Management Conference Statement
Date: December 22, 2020Opposition
Date: October 21, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: October 20, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 18, 2020Answer/General Denial
Date: January 20, 2021Case Management Conference Statement
Date: January 14, 2022Notice
Date: January 31, 2022Case Management Conference Statement
Date: May 20, 2022Supplemental Declaration
Date: November 12, 2021Proof of Service
Date: November 03, 2022Notice
Date: January 20, 2022Declaration
Date: October 20, 2022Case Management Conference Statement
Date: April 28, 2021Stipulation & Order to Continue a Hearing
Date: June 11, 2021Declaration
Date: June 24, 2021Opposition to Motion
Date: June 24, 2021Reply to Opposition
Date: June 30, 2021Declaration
Date: June 30, 2021Case Management Conference Statement
Date: May 11, 2022Proof of Service
Date: June 30, 2021Declaration
Date: June 24, 2021Objection
Date: June 30, 2021Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: October 20, 2022Proof of Service
Date: November 09, 2022Declaration
Date: September 18, 2020Reply to Opposition
Date: November 09, 2022Opposition
Date: November 12, 2021Ruling
Date: January 03, 2022Proof of Service of Summons - Substituted Service
Date: January 25, 2021Declaration
Date: June 24, 2021Case Management Conference Statement
Date: November 04, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet - Plaintiff(s)
Date: September 18, 2020Opposition
Date: October 21, 2021Notice
Date: January 25, 2021Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: March 12, 2021Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: March 12, 2021Declaration
Date: March 12, 2021Declaration
Date: June 24, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: November 22, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: July 08, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: January 19, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: July 08, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: November 19, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: December 10, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: January 31, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: June 06, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: May 17, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: October 22, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: December 05, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: October 21, 2024Motion: Other Pre-Disposition
Date: November 17, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: May 08, 2023Motion: Other Pre-Disposition
Date: May 23, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: October 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2024 | Hearing | Case Management Conference | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Party Appeared by Audio/Video | |
October 30, 2023 | Hearing | Case Management Conference | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Pleading Document | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Pleading Document | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Pleading Document | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Supplemental Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.