Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
City Of Modesto, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Shaverdian, Artin N, Esq., against Wlmbs Inc, represented by Kehoe, Michael I, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Speiller, Stacy presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management125 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 25, 2020 |
CategoryEminent Domain/Invs Condemnation: Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
|
Minute Order- Reassignment
Date: November 05, 2020Minute Order- Reassignment
Date: November 04, 2020Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: November 05, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: December 28, 2020Demurrer
Date: November 06, 2020Complaint
Date: August 25, 2020Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: September 30, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 30, 2020Motion to Strike
Date: December 01, 2020Demurrer
Date: December 01, 2020Motion to Strike
Date: November 06, 2020Notice
Date: October 19, 2020Notice of Demurrer
Date: October 01, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order- Reassignment AMENDED Case Management Conference Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Demurrer AND MOTION TO STRIKE Motion to Strike Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Under Submission
Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Demurrer AND MOTION TO STRIKE Demurrer Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice OF REMOTE APPEARANCE AT DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE HEARING Notice |
|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE Notice |
|
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Demurrer Demurrer Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Demurrer Motion to Strike Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order- Reassignment AMENDED Minute Order- Reassignment |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion & Motion TO CONSOLIDATE Notice of Motion & Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.