Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Onemain Financial Group Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kennard, Robert Scott, Esq., Taneja, Amit, Esq., against Daniel Cardenas Chavez, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Freeland, John D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2020 |
Category3.740 Collections: Limited $0 - $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Declaration in Response to Order to Show Cause
Date: February 09, 2021Complaint
Date: February 19, 2020Court's Motion to Dismiss
Date: January 21, 2022Court Trial
Date: February 26, 2021Court's Motion to Dismiss
Date: August 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2022 | Hearing | Court's Motion to Dismiss | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER-Court Trial Court's Motion to Dismiss Judge: Freeland, John D |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER-Court Trial Court Trial Judge: Freeland, John D |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration in Response to Order to Show Cause | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons - Personal Service | |
August 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non Service | |
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non Service | |
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non Service | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet-Plaintiff(s) Civil Case Cover Sheet - Plaintiff(s) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.