Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Collins, Emily, Esq., against John A Smith, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Freeland, John D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFreeland, John D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2020 |
Category3.740 Collections: Limited $10,000 - $25,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Bank of America, N.A. against John A Smith in the Superior Court of California, County of Stanislaus. The complaint is related to a breach of contract. The jurisdiction of the case is an unlimited civil case, and the case n...
Court's Motion to Dismiss
Date: June 25, 2021Court Trial
Date: April 08, 2022Court Trial
Date: January 29, 2021Complaint
Date: January 29, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2022 | Hearing | Court Trial | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER-Court Trial Court's Motion to Dismiss Judge: Freeland, John D |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER-Court Trial Court Trial Judge: Freeland, John D |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Default Judgment Package Received | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration of Due Diligence | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons - Substituted Service | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Waiver | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.