Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
American Honda Finance Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Alvaradosmith, Yoo, S Christopher, Esq., against Brown, Henry, Smiley, Quandarius, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Freeland, John D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty: Limited $10,000 - $25,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Declaration
Date: January 22, 2021Notice of Entry of Order
Date: April 23, 2020Civil Complaint
Date: January 03, 2020Court's Motion to Dismiss
Date: April 23, 2021Court's Motion to Dismiss
Date: January 29, 2021Motion: Other Pre-Disposition
Date: January 08, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: October 05, 2020Notice
Date: April 10, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER-Court's Motion to Dismiss Court's Motion to Dismiss Judge: Freeland, John D |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER-Court's Motion to Dismiss Court's Motion to Dismiss Judge: Freeland, John D |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration RE COURTS MOTION TO DISMISS Declaration |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER-Motion: Other Pre-Disposition Motion: Other Pre-Disposition Judge: Freeland, John D |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned | |
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion and Motion TO CANCEL AND RELEASE BOND FOR THE WRIT OF POSSESSION Notice of Motion & Motion |
|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Issued | |
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Order FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION Amended Order |
|
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.