Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Esse, Grace, Esq., Winn Law Group, Apc, against Brittney Milam, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Speiller, Stacy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
Category3.740 Collections: Limited $0 - $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Request
Date: October 02, 2020Civil Complaint
Date: December 31, 2019Judgment by Default by Court
Date: August 12, 2020Summons Issued / Filed
Date: December 31, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet - Plaintiff(s)
Date: December 31, 2019Request for Entry of Default - Entered
Date: August 06, 2020Request
Date: October 02, 2020Request for Dismissal - Party Only
Date: August 06, 2020Proof of Service of Summons - Personal Service
Date: January 07, 2020Declaration for Default Judgment
Date: August 06, 2020Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033
Date: August 06, 2020Order
Date: October 13, 2020Civil Complaint
Date: December 31, 2019Case Management Conference Waiver
Date: December 31, 2019Order
Date: October 13, 2020Request for Dismissal - Party Only
Date: August 06, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Order | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Reopened - Civil | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT AND ENTER DISMISSAL Order |
|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT AND ENTER DISMISSAL Request |
|
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Request | |
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Court | |
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Court | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.