Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Wright, Shanna, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Mello, Kenneth M, Esq., against Wright, Tyson, represented by Hedberg, Kenneth R, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Sandhu, Sonny S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2019 |
CategoryOther Real Property: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Declaration
Date: January 31, 2020Stipulation and Order
Date: March 16, 2021Declaration in Response to Order to Show Cause
Date: June 01, 2021Answer/General Denial
Date: March 03, 2020Complaint
Date: December 23, 2019Case Management Conference
Date: August 31, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Case Management Conference & OSC Case Management Conference Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Case Management Conference Case Management Conference Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Case Management Conference Order to Show Cause: Pre-Disposition Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration in Response to Order to Show Cause | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Statement Case Management Conference Statement |
|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Cross Complaint - No Fee | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT Stipulation and Order |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.