Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Aguila, Ana, Aguila, Maria, Aguilera, Sergio, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Carvajal, Johanna, Esq., against Cree, Deborah, Doster, Jessica, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Sandhu, Sonny S. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management271 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2019 |
CategoryAuto Tort: Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a personal injury case filed by Sergio Aguilera, Ana Aguila, Maria Aguila, Sergio Aguilera GAL to Ana Aguilera, and Mario Rosas GAL to Oralia Rosas against Jessica Doster and Deborah Cree. The complaint alleges negligence on the par...
Case Management Conference
Date: September 14, 2020Court's Motion to Dismiss
Date: January 28, 2021Court's Motion to Dismiss
Date: December 17, 2020Petition Hearing: Disputed Claim
Date: January 26, 2021Order Approving Compromise
Date: January 26, 2021Petition to Approve Compromise or Disposition of Proceeds
Date: January 08, 2021Proof of Deposited Funds Hearing
Date: May 05, 2021Proof of Deposited Funds Hearing
Date: March 12, 2021Court's Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 12, 2021Court's Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 05, 2021Court's Motion to Dismiss
Date: June 17, 2021Order to Show Cause: Pre-Disposition
Date: June 17, 2021Request for Dismissal - Entire Action
Date: May 04, 2021Order Approving Compromise
Date: March 29, 2021Declaration in Response to Order to Show Cause
Date: June 04, 2021Complaint
Date: December 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Court's Motion to Dismiss Court's Motion to Dismiss Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Court's Motion to Dismiss Order to Show Cause: Pre-Disposition Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration in Response to Order to Show Cause | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Court's Motion to Dismiss Proof of Deposited Funds Hearing Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Court's Motion to Dismiss Court's Motion to Dismiss Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal - Entire Action WITHOUT PREJUDICE Request for Dismissal - Entire Action |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Receipt & Acknowledgement of Deposit - Blocked Account | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Approving Compromise | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Deposit MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT Order to Deposit |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.