Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Second Round Sub Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Berk, Camryn P, Esq., against Diana Ocampocamacho, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Freeland, John D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 25, 2019 |
Category3.740 Collections: Small Claims Juris Limited $0 - $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Court's Motion to Dismiss
Date: October 15, 2021Court's Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 07, 2021Court Trial
Date: December 04, 2020Statement of Venue
Date: November 25, 2019Complaint
Date: November 25, 2019Court's Motion to Dismiss
Date: October 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2022 | Hearing | Court's Motion to Dismiss | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Court's Motion to Dismiss Court's Motion to Dismiss Judge: Freeland, John D |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Court's Motion to Dismiss Court's Motion to Dismiss Judge: Freeland, John D |
|
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER-Court Trial Court Trial Judge: Freeland, John D |
|
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons - Personal Service | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Statement of Venue | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration for Reduced Filing Fee | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Waiver | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet - Plaintiff(s) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.