Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Velocity Investments Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Sherer, Joel E, Esq., against Ensizo, Jose Jesus, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Sandhu, Sonny S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandhu, Sonny S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 07, 2019 |
Category3.740 Collections: Small Claims Juris Limited $0 - $10,000 |
Time To Trial372 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions300 days |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Minute Order- Reassignment
Date: January 29, 2020Request for Dismissal - Party Only
Date: March 02, 2020Court Trial
Date: November 25, 2020Court's Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 18, 2021Complaint
Date: May 07, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Court Trial Court's Motion to Dismiss Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Court Trial Court Trial Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Reviewed by Court | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Party Only | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration RE CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST AND ATTORNEYS FEES Declaration |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default Judgment | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033 | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration Re: Copies in Lieu of Originals | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default - Entered |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.