Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Vazquez, Erik Ferreyra, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Ly, Liane Katzenstein, Esq., against Ngb Construction Inc, represented by Crass, Steven M, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Sandhu, Sonny S. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management123 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2019 |
CategoryOther Employment: Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
This complaint is a class action complaint filed by Erik Ferreyra Vazquez, also known as Erik Vazquez F, against NGB Construction, Inc. The proposed class includes all individuals who have been employed by NGB Construction in California as laborers o...
Summons on Amended Complaint
Date: May 06, 2019Notice
Date: February 14, 2020Amended Complaint
Date: May 06, 2019Stipulation and Order
Date: October 13, 2020Minute Order- Reassignment
Date: February 10, 2020Stipulation & Order to ADR
Date: January 10, 2020Stipulation
Date: January 06, 2020Answer/General Denial
Date: June 14, 2019Answer/General Denial
Date: April 04, 2019Complaint
Date: February 28, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Case Management Conference Case Management Conference Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Case Management Conference Case Management Conference Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Statement Case Management Conference Statement |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Statement Case Management Conference Statement |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Case Management Conference Case Management Conference Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Statement Case Management Conference Statement |
|
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Statement Case Management Conference Statement |
|
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE Notice |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation AND ORDER PROTECTIVE ORDER Stipulation and Order |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.